WA HB1199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health care for working individuals with disabilities.
Title
Concerning health care for working individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 70, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-06 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5754 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.