WA HB1199 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding retainage of funds on public works projects.
Title
Regarding retainage of funds on public works projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 219, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-05 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5396 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.