WA HB1198 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the state commercial aviation coordinating commission.
Title
Concerning the state commercial aviation coordinating commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |