WA HB1197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health care decisions made by a designated person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health care decisions made by a designated person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2022-01-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2021-04-25HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-04HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-04House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-01-29HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-29HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
770065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1197&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1197.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1197-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1197-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1197-S%20AMH%20RICC%20H1212.3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1197-S%20AMH%20ABBA%20LEIN%20214.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1197-S%20AMH%20GILY%20LEIN%20216.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1197-S%20AMH%20WALJ%20LEIN%20215.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1197%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1197%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1197-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1197-S.E%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1197-S.E%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123441&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28409&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123441&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1197&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback