WA HB1196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning audio-only telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning audio-only telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-03HouseChapter 157, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-03HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-26SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-26SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-24House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-03HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-03HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5325 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4105New CodeSee Bill Text
4843New CodeSee Bill Text
7124New CodeSee Bill Text
7409New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1196&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1196.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1196-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1196-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1196-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1196-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1196-S%20AMH%20RICC%20H1083.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1196-S%20AMH%20CALD%20MORI%20011.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1196-S%20AMH%20CALD%20MORI%20012.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1196-S%20AMH%20RICC%20MORI%20014.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1196-S.E%20AMS%20HLTC%20S2315.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1196-S.E%20AMS%20WM%20S2589.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1196%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1196%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1196-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1196-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1196-S.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1196-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123440&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28466&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123440&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123440&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28924&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123440&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123440&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123440&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback