WA HB1196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing for the year round observation of daylight saving time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing for the year round observation of daylight saving time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseEffective date 7/28/2019**.
2019-05-08HouseChapter 297, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23HousePassed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-27SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2019-03-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1196&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1196.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1196-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1196-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1196-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117671&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117671&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117671&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1196&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback