WA HB1196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Title
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5175 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.