WA HB1194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing toxic pollution that affects public health or the environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing toxic pollution that affects public health or the environment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-12HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-12HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Same As/Similar To

SB5135 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback