WA HB1194 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning crisis referral services for criminal justice and correctional personnel.
Title
Concerning crisis referral services for criminal justice and correctional personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Ericks [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5131 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1194&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1194.pdf |