WA HB1193 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Affirming the process for disposing of dredged materials for federal navigation channel maintenance and improvement.
Title
Affirming the process for disposing of dredged materials for federal navigation channel maintenance and improvement.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Chapter 299, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-09 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5125 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 58 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | 356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |