WA HB1192 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.
Title
Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 65, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-03-08 | House | Held on third reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 08 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 670 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 115 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 58 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 66 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 86 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 104 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 106 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 210 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27 | 580 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 27a | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 405 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 51 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 10 | 926 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 130 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 05 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35a | 56 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 32 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 26 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 26 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 34 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 131 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 131 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19 | 623 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19 | 637 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19 | 800 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19a | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 20 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 20 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21k | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21k | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21k | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 30 | 570 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 42 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 70 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 70 | 660 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 83 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 16a | 060 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 37 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 55 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 80 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 01 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 28 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 70 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 12 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 08 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 54 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 04 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 08 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 44 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 07 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 48 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 55 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 60 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 60 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 80 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 290 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 79 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 97 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 325 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 325 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 330 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 345 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 445 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 45 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 45 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 530 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 04 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 09 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 12 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 60 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78 | 44 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78 | 56 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78 | 56 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78 | 56 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78 | 56 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 100 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 100 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 05 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 05 | 189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 25 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 01 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 04 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 04 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 04 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 28 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 70 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 70 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 04 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 88 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 44 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |