WA HB1191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning school notifications.
Title
Concerning school notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 167, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5554 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.