WA HB1188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of child passenger restraint systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of child passenger restraint systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2018-01-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2018-01-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-31Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-01-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-17SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-17SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-17SenateTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-17SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Transportation.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-03-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-28SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2017-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2017-02-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2017-02-20HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-02-20HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-20HouseFloor amendment
2017-02-14HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-08HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback