WA HB1186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of and reimbursement for certain court interpreter services.
Title
Concerning the provision of and reimbursement for certain court interpreter services.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |