WA HB1181 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing programs and measures to prevent suicide among veterans and military members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing programs and measures to prevent suicide among veterans and military members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-28HouseHHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43216New CodeSee Bill Text
4360aNew CodeSee Bill Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text
4370445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4618New CodeSee Bill Text
7404New CodeSee Bill Text
941New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback