WA HB1179 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting cider makers from the wine commission assessment.
Title
Exempting cider makers from the wine commission assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/1/2015. |
2015-04-24 | House | Chapter 76, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-04 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-04 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB5260 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.