WA HB1173 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state lands development authorities.
Title
Concerning state lands development authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 259, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2021-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-29 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:30 AM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
Subjects
CITIES AND TOWNS
LAND USE PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
PUBLIC LANDS
REAL ESTATE AND REAL PROPERTY
LAND USE PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
PUBLIC LANDS
REAL ESTATE AND REAL PROPERTY
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | New Code | See Bill Text |