WA HB1173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain obsolete common school provisions.
Title
Repealing certain obsolete common school provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5071 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1173&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1173.pdf |