WA HB1173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing military service credit for members of the Washington state patrol retirement system.
Title
Addressing military service credit for members of the Washington state patrol retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5061 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1173&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1173.pdf |