WA HB1172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing judicially affirmed and treaty-reserved fishing rights and promoting state-tribal cooperative agreements in the management of salmon, trout, and steelhead resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing judicially affirmed and treaty-reserved fishing rights and promoting state-tribal cooperative agreements in the management of salmon, trout, and steelhead resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-25SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-03HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB5199 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-13 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77110010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
77110020Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
77110030Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
77110040Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
77110900Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1172&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1172.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1172%20HBA%20RDAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1172%20HBR%20RDAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1172%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1172%20SBA%20AWNP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1172%20SBR%20AWNP%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1172%20SBR%20AWNP%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123368&actionText=RDAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28441&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123368&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1172&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123368&actionText=AWNP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28887&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback