WA HB1171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Directing the completion of a study of certain environmental impacts, including ultrafine particulate emissions, associated with aircraft traffic in areas impacted by airport operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the completion of a study of certain environmental impacts, including ultrafine particulate emissions, associated with aircraft traffic in areas impacted by airport operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-09HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment

Same As/Similar To

SB5225 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback