WA HB1170 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Building economic strength through manufacturing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building economic strength through manufacturing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 64, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateBFST - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-03-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-03-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-09House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-03HouseCED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:30 AM.
2021-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Community & Economic Development.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1170&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1170.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1170-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1170-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1170-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170%20HBA%20CED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170%20HBR%20CED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1170-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1170-S%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123366&actionText=CED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28444&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123366&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20Community%20%26amp%3B%20Economic%20Development.&mId=28620&isInit=False&b
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123366&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1170&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123366&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28816&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123366&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123366&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1170&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback