WA HB1169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying reimbursement for certain clean-up or removal actions by fire protection jurisdictions.
Title
Clarifying reimbursement for certain clean-up or removal actions by fire protection jurisdictions.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |