WA HB1169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the student opportunity, assistance, and relief act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the student opportunity, assistance, and relief act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-22HouseChapter 199, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27SenateCommittee amendment
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-20SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2018-01-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2018-01-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-31Senate3rd substitute bill substituted
2018-01-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-22SenateAPP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-04-03SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-03-28SenateHIE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education.
2017-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01House2nd substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-24HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-24HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-24HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-14HouseHE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Higher Education

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1169&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1169.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1169-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1169-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1169-S3.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1169-S3.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1169-S3.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1169&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1169&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-31-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1169&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1169&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2018

Bill Comments

feedback