WA HB1168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Higher Education.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Higher Education.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting student success at community and technical colleges by increasing full-time faculty.
Title
Supporting student success at community and technical colleges by increasing full-time faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |