WA HB1167 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-06 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Thurston county superior court judges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Thurston county superior court judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-01-29HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
208065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1167&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1167.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1167%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1167%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1167%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1167%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123350&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28409&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123350&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28620&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123350&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1167&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback