WA HB1166 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding access to the homeless and foster care college students pilot program.
Title
Expanding access to the homeless and foster care college students pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 62, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2021-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-01 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Subjects
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS PERSONS
STUDENT ACHIEVEMENT COUNCIL
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
FOSTER CARE
HOMELESS PERSONS
STUDENT ACHIEVEMENT COUNCIL
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 50 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 77 | 850 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |