WA HB1162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning human remains.
Title
Concerning human remains.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5001 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/1/2020.