WA HB1159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning employment after public service in state government.
Title
Concerning employment after public service in state government.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-12 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-01 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5120 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.