WA HB1158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the fair treatment of underserved groups in public employment, education, and contracting.
Title
Restoring the fair treatment of underserved groups in public employment, education, and contracting.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1158&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1158.pdf |