WA HB1156 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing representation and voter participation in local elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing representation and voter participation in local elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-18HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-18HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government & Tribal Relations.
2021-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-11HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-11HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a343320Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a04New CodeSee Bill Text
29a04127Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
29a04330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a24010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a36170Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
29a52New CodeSee Bill Text
29a52112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a52210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a52220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a60221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a92070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a92080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a92130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3517020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3518270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3523051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3527090Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3530080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3561050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35a02050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35a12040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3632030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3632040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3632050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36320554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3669070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3669090Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3693051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3693061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5214New CodeSee Bill Text
5312New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1156&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1156.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1156-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20BOEH%20ZOLL%20141.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20DUFA%20ZOLL%20144.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20DUFA%20ZOLL%20145.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20142.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20146.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20147.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20148.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20149.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20150.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20GRAH%20ZOLL%20151.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20ZOLL%20138.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20ZOLL%20139.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20ZOLL%20140.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20ZOLL%20143.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20BOEH%20ZOLL%20153.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1156-S%20AMH%20HATA%20ZOLL%20152.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1156%20HBA%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1156%20HBR%20SGOV%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1156%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123328&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28524&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123328&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20State%20Government%20%26amp%3B%20Tribal%20Relations.&mId=28619&isInit=Fa

Bill Comments 750

feedback