WA HB1155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Chapter 297, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Vote on committee amendment reconsidered. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |