WA HB1155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning meal and rest breaks and mandatory overtime for certain health care employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning meal and rest breaks and mandatory overtime for certain health care employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-05-08HouseChapter 296, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-27HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 70; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-24SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report; received 6:05 PM 4/23/2019.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report; received 6:00 PM 4/23/2019.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Dhingra, King, Van De Wege.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee request granted.
2019-04-22HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Cody, Mosbrucker, Sells.
2019-04-22HouseHouse refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon.
2019-04-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-16SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-03SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-03-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-03-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-19SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-06HouseHeld on second reading.
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-25HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-31HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-31HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-31HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Same As/Similar To

SB5190 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Senate Rules "X" file.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1155&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1155.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1155-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1155-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1155-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117590&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117590&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117590&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117590&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback