WA HB1155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making felony sex offenses a crime that may be prosecuted at any time after its commission.
Title
Making felony sex offenses a crime that may be prosecuted at any time after its commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-01-19 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |