WA HB1155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning sales and use tax for emergency communication systems and facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-13HouseChapter 297, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-13HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-14HousePassed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-05SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-05SenateVote on committee amendment reconsidered.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-05SenateHeld on calendar.
2021-04-05SenateCommittee amendment
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-23SenateHLG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2021-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-18HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2021-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1155&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1155.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1155-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1155-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1155-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1155-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20TUCK%20032.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1155-S%20AMH%20VOLZ%20TUCK%20033.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1155-S%20AMH%20CHAS%20H1189.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20HLG%20S2254.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S2413.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S2472.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S2472.3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20RICS%20121.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1155-S%20AMS%20ENGR%20S2254.E.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1155-S%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1155-S%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1155-S%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155-S%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1155-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1155-S%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123327&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28670&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123327&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123327&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28947&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123327&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123327&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1155&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback