WA HB1148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting patients in acute care hospitals.
Title
Protecting patients in acute care hospitals.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 61, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-27 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 41 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |