WA HB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington state office of resiliency.
Title
Creating the Washington state office of resiliency.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Alicia Rule [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-10 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-10 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AND SERVICES
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
NATURAL DISASTERS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AND SERVICES
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
GOVERNOR
LOCAL GOVERNMENT
NATURAL DISASTERS
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | New Code | See Bill Text |