WA HB1145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the use of nonwood renewable fiber in recycled content paper carryout bags.
Title
Allowing the use of nonwood renewable fiber in recycled content paper carryout bags.
Sponsors
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-14 | House | Chapter 33, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-05 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | 530 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 530 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |