WA HB1145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Washington child care access for resident employees of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Washington child care access for resident employees of the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-29HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-29HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback