WA HB1143 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 4/21/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date 4/21/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the placement of water rights banked pursuant to RCW 90.92.070 into the trust water rights program.
Title
Authorizing the placement of water rights banked pursuant to RCW 90.92.070 into the trust water rights program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Effective date 4/21/2021. |
2021-04-21 | House | Chapter 110, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2021-02-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-03 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |