WA HB1141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to the death with dignity act.
Title
Increasing access to the death with dignity act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-01-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-01-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-20 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 245 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 245 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 245 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 41 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |