WA HB1140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile access to attorneys when contacted by law enforcement.
Title
Concerning juvenile access to attorneys when contacted by law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Effective date 1/1/2022. |
2021-05-18 | House | Chapter 328, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Subjects
ATTORNEYS
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL
PUBLIC DEFENSE, OFFICE
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
LAW ENFORCEMENT AND LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL
PUBLIC DEFENSE, OFFICE
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 40 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 40 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 70 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |