WA HB1135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting oil spill contingency planning requirements to those railroads that haul oils used as fuel.
Title
Limiting oil spill contingency planning requirements to those railroads that haul oils used as fuel.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Terry Nealey [R] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB5137 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1135&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1135.pdf |