WA HB1133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting liability for registered apiarists.
Title
Limiting liability for registered apiarists.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 257, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-01 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |