WA HB1130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer affordability and reliability in energy supply.
Title
Concerning consumer affordability and reliability in energy supply.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Mark Klicker [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 405 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 405 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | New Code | See Bill Text |