WA HB1126 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting tolling of community custody terms.
Title
Limiting tolling of community custody terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |