WA HB1121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the frequency of Puget Sound action agenda implementation strategy and science work plan updates.
Title
Concerning the frequency of Puget Sound action agenda implementation strategy and science work plan updates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-19 | House | Chapter 54, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-13 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |