WA HB1120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state of emergency operations impacting long-term services and supports.
Title
Concerning state of emergency operations impacting long-term services and supports.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 5/10/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 203, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 81; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-02-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-02-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-27 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCIES
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
LONG-TERM CARE
EMERGENCIES
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
LONG-TERM CARE
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 51 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 51 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 79 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 88a | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 88a | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 88b | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 43 | 832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 43 | 837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 128 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 128 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 97 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 42 | 360 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |