WA HB1116 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Implementing family and medical leave insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing family and medical leave insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-06-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-01-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-01-23HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2017-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Same As/Similar To

SB5032 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-28 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback