WA HB1112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Feb 18 @ 3:30 pm in House Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing greenhouse gas emissions from hydrofluorocarbons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing greenhouse gas emissions from hydrofluorocarbons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM
2019-02-18HouseScheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-01-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-24HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-24HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-01-10HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5426 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback